+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 144; Eff. 8/15/2017
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/01/2017 HJ 17 P. 127
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/31/2017); SJ 19
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1312s (Rep. McGuire): MA VV 05/18/2017 HJ 16 P. 6
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1312s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; SJ 14
- Committee Amendment #2017-1312s, AA, VV; 04/20/2017; SJ 14
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1312s, 04/20/2017; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 19
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/05/2017, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 17
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 9
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0688h: MA VV 03/08/2017 HJ 9 P. 28
- Amendment #2017-0688h: AA VV 03/08/2017 HJ 9 P. 28
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0688h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/01/2017 01:00 PM LOB 306
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/21/2017 10:00 AM LOB 306
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/15/2017 10:00 AM LOB 306
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 3 P. 20
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor