+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0993h: MA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10
- Amendment # 2023-0993h: AA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0993h 03/15/2023 (Vote 19-1; RC) HC 16 P. 15
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 03/07/2023 10:00 am LOB210-211
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 02:45 pm LOB 302-304
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs