+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: RC 221-157 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote HJ 21 P. 43
On August 21, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019
On July 29, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 59
On July 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2660e: AA VV 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 57
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2660e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2019-2555c; RC 14Y-10N, Adopted; 06/27/2019; SJ 21
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Warden) 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 31
- Conference Committee Report 2555c: Adopted, VV 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 48
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2555c; 06/27/2019
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferee Change; Senator Watters Replaces Senator Bradley; SJ 21
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 06/18/2019 12:00 pm LOB 304
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Fuller Clark, Feltes, Bradley; (In Recess 06/06/2019); SJ 20
- Sen. Fuller Clark Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; (In recess 06/06/2019); SJ 20
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Backus, Saunderson, McWilliams, Mann 06/06/2019 HJ 18 P. 41
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1892s and 2019-1987s and Requests CofC (Rep. Backus): MA VV 06/06/2019 HJ 18 P. 41
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-1892s, and 2019-1987s, RC 14Y-10N, MA; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; SJ 16
- Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2019-1987s, AA, VV; 05/15/2019; SJ 16
- Committee Amendment # 2019-1892s, AA, VV; 05/15/2019; SJ 16
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1892s, 05/15/2019; SC 22
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/09/2019, Room 103, SH, 09:00 am; SC 17
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 12
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0795h: MA RC 215-133 03/20/2019 HJ 11 P. 33
- Amendment # 2019-0795h: AA VV 03/20/2019 HJ 11 P. 33
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0795h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 11-8; RC) HC 16 P. 34
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:30 am LOB 304
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm LOB 304
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 3 P. 21
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
September 18, 2019: Veto Override
- Yeas: 221
- Nays: 157
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 13
June 27, 2019: Conference Committee Report
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
May 15, 2019: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
March 20, 2019: OTPA
- Yeas: 215
- Nays: 133
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 42
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor