+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 28, 2016 in the House:
- Interim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 16-1)
On September 8, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/11/2016 09:30 AM LOB 207
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 01/06/2016 HJ 4 P. 34
On November 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; CC); HC 67, PG. 6
On September 9, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
On August 13, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/9/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/9/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/26/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/5/2015 9:45 AM LOB 207
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 1:30 PM LOB 207
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Education; HJ 12, PG. 230