+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/27/2019 HJ 6 P. 25
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 13 P. 15
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/07/2019 02:00 pm LOB 202
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 10:30 am LOB 202
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 3 P. 20