+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 135; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 06/25/2019
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/23/2019 HJ 16 P. 51
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); SJ 19
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2011e: AA VV 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 102
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2011e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 05/15/2019);
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1603s (Rep. Myler): MA VV 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 2
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1603s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; SJ 15
- Committee Amendment # 2019-1603s, AA, VV; 05/02/2019; SJ 15
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1603s, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 20
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 103, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 18
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; SJ 9
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0041h: MA VV 02/27/2019 HJ 6 P. 7
- Amendment # 2019-0041h: AA VV 02/27/2019 HJ 6 P. 7
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0041h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 13 P. 6
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:30 am LOB 207
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 01:00 pm LOB 207
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education HJ 3 P. 20