+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2023 01:30 pm LOB 210-211
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/02/2023 01:30 pm LOB 210-211
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 10:30 am LOB 210-211
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 20
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor