+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 5, 2023 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 10/03/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211 HC 36
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/28/2023 09:00 am LOB 210-211
On March 17, 2023 in the House:
- Division Work Session: 03/24/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/15/2023 11:00 am LOB 210-211
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 03/14/2023 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Division Work Session: 03/06/2023 02:00 pm LOB 210-211
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0304h: AA DV 182-172 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 48
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0304h: MA RC 184-179 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 48
- Referred to Finance 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 50
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/08/2023 (Vote ; RC) HC 12 P. 13
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2023 01:30 pm LOB 210-211
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/02/2023 01:30 pm LOB 210-211
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 20
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 22, 2023: OTPA
- Yeas: 184
- Nays: 179
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor