+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, MA, VV; 06/16/2020 SJ 8
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 7
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2861h (NT): MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 46
- Amendment # 2019-2861h (NT): AA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 46
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2861h (NT) (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 50
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On September 23, 2019 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Division III Work Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am LOB 210-211
- Division III Work Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Finance Division III Work Session: 03/11/2019 01:30 pm LOB 210-211
- Finance Division III Work Session: 03/13/2019 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
- Finance Division III Work Session: 03/22/2019 10:00 am LOB 209
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Finance Division III Work Session: 03/06/2019 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Finance 02/28/2019 HJ 7 P. 42
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0552h: MA DV 244-92 02/28/2019 HJ 7 P. 41
- Amendment # 2019-0552h: AA VV 02/28/2019 HJ 7 P. 41
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Rep. McGuire) 02/27/2019 HJ 6 P. 2
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0552h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 17-1; CC) HC 13 P. 2
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/19/2019 01:00 pm LOB 206
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 11:15 am LOB 206
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law HJ 3 P. 20