+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 7, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 199; Section 3 Effective 6/30/2015, Remaining Effective 7/6/2015
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ 54, PG. 2102
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); SJ 19
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1710s (Rep Kotowski): MA VV; HJ 44, PG. 1813
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1710s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 15
- Sen. Kelly Floor Amendment #2015-1898s, RC 10Y-14N, AF; SJ 15
- Committee Amendment 1710s, AA, VV
- Special Order HB 564 to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, MA; SJ 15
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1710s, 5/21/15; SC22
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/14/15, Room 101, LOB, 1:40 p.m.; SC17
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 10
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0312h: MA VV; HJ 26, PG. 1210
- Amendment #0312h: AA VV; HJ 26, PG. 1210
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0312h for Mar 11 (Vote 13-4; RC); HC19, PG. 426
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/3/2015 LOB 205
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 2:30 PM LOB 205
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- ==CANCELED== Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 1:15 PM LOB 206-208
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; HJ 12, PG. 231
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
May 21, 2015: Sen. Kelly Floor Amendment 1898s
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 14