+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, RC 15Y-9N; SJ 9
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 4/17/14; SC14
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/3/14, Room 101, LOB, 1:00 p.m.; SC12
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment MA RC 212-129
- Floor Amendment #2014-0026h (Rep. Williams) AA RC 200-140
- Adopt Amendment #2311h AA VV
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2311h (New Title)
On November 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2311h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-3; RC); HC 2
On October 4, 2013 in the House:
- ==Rescheduled== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:30 AM LOB 302
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2013 9:15 AM LOB 302
On September 10, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 1:00 PM LOB 302
- ==Cancelled==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 AM LOB 302
- ==ROOM CHANGE==Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2013 9:45 AM LOB 301
On July 29, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/10/2013 10:00 AM LOB 302
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/25/2013 10:00 AM LOB 302
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/11/2013 11:00 AM LOB 302
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/23/2013 11:30 AM LOB 302
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 AM LOB 302
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/28/2013 1:15 PM LOB 302
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; HJ 12, PG.200
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2014: Interim Study
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 9
January 15, 2014: Adopt AM #0026h
- Yeas: 200
- Nays: 140
January 15, 2014: OTPA
- Yeas: 212
- Nays: 129