+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 1/6/16; SC49
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 9/22/15, Room 103, LOB, 10:20 a.m.; SC34
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV, SJ 12
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 4/30/15; SC19
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/14/15, Room 103, LOB, 10:00 a.m.; SC17
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Education; SJ 10
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0696h: MA VV
- Amendment #0696h: AA VV; HJ 24, PG. 874-875
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0696h for Mar 11 (Vote 18-3; RC); HC19, PG. 421
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/5/2015 9:45 AM LOB 207
- Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 2:45 PM LOB 207
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Education; HJ 12, PG. 229