+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On August 19, 2020 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/10/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99566391883 - Executive Session to Follow
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 38
On November 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 50 P. 6
On October 4, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am LOB 308
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 10:00 am LOB 307
On September 4, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2019 01:00 pm LOB 307
On August 16, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 08/29/2019 01:00 pm LOB 308
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/12/2019 11:00 am LOB 308
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 11:30 am LOB 308
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law HJ 3 P. 19