+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed By Governor 06/28/2013; Effective 08/27/2013; Chapter 0154
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled [Recess of 6/5/13]; HJ49, PG.1648
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg;
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/23/13; Vote 5-0; CC; SC21
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/26/13, Room 100, SH, 10:00 a.m.; SC13
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Judiciary
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0484h: MA VV; HJ 26, PG.802
- Amendment #0484h: AA VV; HJ 26, PG.802
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0484h; HC 22, PG.556
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0484h for Mar 13 (Vote 18-0; Part II, RC); HC 22, PG.521
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/21/2013 10:00 AM LOB 206
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2013 3:00 PM LOB 206
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 10:00 AM LOB 206
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Children and Family Law; HJ 12, PG.200