+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 13-0; CC); HC 67, PG. 10
On September 16, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/6/2015 2:00 PM LOB 301
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/15/2015 1:00 PM LOB 301
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/7/2015 1:00 PM LOB 301
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/17/2015 1:30 PM LOB 301
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 2:20 PM LOB 301
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; HJ 12, PG. 229