+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV; HJ 26, PG. 1262-1263
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 16-3; RC); HC19, PG. 435
- Executive Session: 3/3/2015 LOB 304
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 1:15 PM LOB 304
- ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 3:15 PM LOB 304
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 3:15 PM LOB 304
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; HJ 12, PG. 229