+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 9, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 08/04/2023; Chapter 198; eff: 08/04/2023 HJ 17
On July 19, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 18
On July 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2023-2197c, Adopted, VV; 06/29/2023; SJ 20
On June 29, 2023 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2023-2197c: Adopted, DV 186-185 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 10
On June 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2023-2197c; 06/29/2023
On June 19, 2023 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 06/19/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Ward, Lang, Fenton; 06/15/2023; SJ 19
- Sen. Ward Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; 06/15/2023; SJ 19
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-1419s and Requests CofC (Reps. Ladd, Peternel, Drye, Luneau): MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 75
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-1419s, RC 14Y-10N, AA; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
- Sen. Soucy Moved to divide the Question on the motion of Ought to Pass with Amendment: Sections 1, 2 and 4, and then Sections 3 and 4; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
- The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #2023-1419s: Sections 1, 2 and 4, MA, VV; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #2023-1419s: Sections 3 and 4, RC 14Y-10N, MA; OT3rdg; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
On April 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1419s, 05/11/2023; SC 21
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/04/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am, on proposed amendment # 2023-1225s; SC 16
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/28/2023, Room 101, LOB, 10:00 am; SC 15
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/16/2023 and Referred to Education; SJ 11
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/16/2023 HJ 9 P. 4
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/06/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 16 P. 4
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/06/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/16/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education HJ 3 P. 19
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2023: Committee Amendment
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Nay
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Nay
- Lou D'Allesandro: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Nay
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Nay
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Nay
- Donovan Fenton: Nay
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Nay
- Rebecca Whitley: Nay
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Nay
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea
May 11, 2023: Ought to Pass w/ Amendment Sections 3 & 4
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Nay
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Nay
- Lou D'Allesandro: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Nay
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Nay
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Nay
- Donovan Fenton: Nay
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Nay
- Rebecca Whitley: Nay
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Nay
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea