+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 3, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 60
On November 15, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB533-FN 11/08/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 49 P. 17
On September 26, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
On September 22, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
- Full Committee Work Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
On September 11, 2023 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208 HC 37
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 06/27/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208
On May 17, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 06/07/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing on Amendment # 2023-0705h: 03/08/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/08/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/09/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary HJ 3 P. 19
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor