+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/03/2018 HJ 1 P. 33
On November 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On October 5, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/19/2017 10:00 AM LOB 308
- ==RESCHEDULED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2017 10:00 AM LOB 308
On October 4, 2017 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2017 10:00 AM LOB 308
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 11:30 AM LOB 308
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/26/2017 11:20 AM LOB 308
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 01:00 PM LOB 308
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Election Law HJ 3 P. 17