+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On November 12, 2015 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2515h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 6-5; RC); HC 67, PG. 21
On October 21, 2015 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 10/29/2015 1:30 PM LOB 306
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/21/2015 11:00 AM LOB 306==RECESSED==
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/21/2015 10:00 AM LOB 306
On September 15, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2015 10:00 AM LOB 306
On August 17, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/15/2015 11:00 AM LOB 306
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/2/2015 1:00 PM LOB 306
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/19/2015 9:00 AM LOB 306
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/12/2015 10:00 AM LOB 306
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/2/2015 12:30 PM LOB 306
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 1:00 PM LOB 306
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; HJ 12, PG. 227
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor