+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 7, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 197; Effective 7/6/2015
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ 54, PG. 2135
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); SJ 19
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1266s (Rep Hunt): MA VV; HJ 46, PG. 1988
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1266s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 12
- Committee Amendment 1266s, AA, VV
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1266s, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; CC; SC19
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1266s, 4/23/15; Vote 5-0; CC; SC18
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/1/15, Room 100, SH, 2:00 p.m.; SC15
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce; SJ 10
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ 24, PG. 773
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 13-3; CC); HC19, PG. 394
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM LOB 302
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 AM LOB 302
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 11:00 AM LOB 302
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; HJ 12, PG. 226