+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On September 5, 2023 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 10/03/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211 HC 36
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/15/2023 11:00 am LOB 210-211
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 03/15/2023 09:45 am LOB 210-211
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 03/07/2023 01:00 pm LOB 104
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 02/27/2023 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Division III Work Session: 02/15/2023 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/09/2023 10:45 am LOB 210-211
- Division Work Session: 02/09/2023 11:30 am LOB 210-211
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Vacated and Referred to Finance (Reps. Packard, Osborne): MA VV 01/24/2023 HJ 3 P. 25
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor