+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 260; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/19/2019
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 53
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2461e: AA VV 06/06/2019 HJ 18 P. 46
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2461e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/06/2019); SJ 20
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; SJ 18
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 24A
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 101, LOB, 01:00 pm; SC 18
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 10
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/14/2019 HJ 9 P. 37
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Special Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection HJ 8 P. 60
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 11-8; RC) HC 14 P. 19
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/26/2019 10:15 am LOB 304
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/12/2019 01:30 pm LOB 304
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 3 P. 18
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor