+ − Actions (16)
On August 3, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/30/2021; Chapter 171; Eff: 09/28/2021
On July 15, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/24/2021); SJ 20
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1411s (Rep. Hunt): MA VV 06/10/2021 HJ 10 P. 1
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1411s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/20/2021; SJ 16
- Committee Amendment # 2021-1411s, AA, VV; 05/20/2021; SJ 16
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1411s, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 24
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remote Hearing: 04/20/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; SC 20
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 11
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): MF VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 50
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 6
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 18 P. 5
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98917516497 (if necessary)
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95215897452
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/10/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95521072179 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 2 P. 52
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor