+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 08/03/2013; Chapter 0049
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled 4/24/2013; HJ38, PG.1257
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled 4/18/2013
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-1363e(NT) Adopted; HJ38, PG.1257
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #1363e, NT, Adopted
- Ought to Pass: RC 24Y-0N, MA; OT3rdg;
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/18/13; SC16
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/20/13, Room 100, SH, 10:35 a.m.; SC12
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced 2/14/2013 and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin.; SJ 6
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0333h: MA VV; HJ 21, PG.468
- Amendment #0333h: AA VV; HJ 21, PG.468
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0333h; HC 15, PG.297
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0333h for Feb 20 (Vote 19-0; CC); HC 15, PG.268
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/12/2013 11:30 AM LOB 201
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 10:00 AM LOB 201
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Public Works and Highways; HJ 12, PG.198