+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 7/20/2015; Chapter 263; Parts II and III of section 4 effective as provided in section 5, Sections 9 & 11 effective 10/1/2017 at 12:01 a.m., Sections 6-8 & 10 effective 1/1/2017, Sections 12-14 effective 1/1/2021, Remaining effective 7/20/2015
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of 6/24/2015); HJ 54, PG. 2142
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); SJ 19
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2362EBA: AA VV (In recess of 6/24/2015); HJ 54, PG. 2140-2141
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2362e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 6/24/2015); SJ 19
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2291c: Adopted, DV 243-99; HJ 54, PG. 2125-2126
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 2291c; Adopted, VV; SJ 19
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report #2015-2291c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- ==Continued==Conference Committee Meeting: 6/17/2015 1:30 PM LOB 302
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 6/17/2015 9:00 AM LOB 302==Recessed==
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Conferee Change: Rep Hannon Replaces Rep Hurt; HJ 46, PG. 1990
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Carson, Bradley and Soucy
- Sen. Carson accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; SJ 18
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps Hunt, Jones, Butler, Hurt; HJ 46, PG. 1988
- House Non Concurs with Senate Amendments and Requests Committee of Conference (Rep Hunt): MA VV; HJ 46, PG. 1988
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment 1991s, AA, VV
- Special Order HB 508 to the end of the Calendar, Without Objection, MA; SJ 17
- Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2015-2033s, NT, AA, VV; SJ 17
- Sen. Carson Floor Amendment #2015-2046s, AA, VV; SJ 17
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1991s, 2046, and 2033, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 17
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1991s, 6/4/15; SC24
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/22/15, Room 101, LOB, 10:00 a.m.; SC17
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 10
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0674h: MA VV; HJ 24, PG. 835-836
- Amendment #0674: AA VV; HJ 24, PG. 835-836
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0674h for Mar 11 (Vote 15-1; RC); HC19, PG. 415
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM LOB 302
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 AM LOB 302
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 8:30 AM LOB 302
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 10:00 AM LOB 302
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Vacated from Judiciary and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; HJ 14, PG. 274
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; HJ 12, PG. 227
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor