+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-0; CC)
On October 25, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/09/2017 10:00 AM LOB 206
On September 19, 2017 in the House:
- Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 10:00 AM LOB 206
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/09/2017 10:00 AM LOB 206
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/28/2017 10:00 AM LOB 206
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/21/2017 10:00 AM LOB 206
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Children and Family Law HJ 3 P. 16