+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 10, 2024 in the House:
- Died on Table, Session ended 10/10/2024 HJ 17
On January 4, 2024 in the House:
- Lay HB505 on Table (Rep. Myler): MA VV 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 103
On November 17, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 11/13/2023 (Vote 10-10; RC) HC 49 P. 29
On October 25, 2023 in the House:
- Full Work Session: 10/31/2023 11:00 am LOB 205-207 HC 43
On October 10, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/13/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On September 20, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 10/12/2023 01:00 pm LOB 205-207 HC 38
On August 24, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/19/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On June 19, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 06/28/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm LOB 205-207
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/15/2023 09:00 am LOB 205-207
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 11:15 am LOB 205-207
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education HJ 3 P. 18