+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 24, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/19/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On June 19, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 06/28/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm LOB 205-207
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/15/2023 09:00 am LOB 205-207
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 11:15 am LOB 205-207
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education HJ 3 P. 18