+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 171; Eff: 09/08/2019
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/13/2019 HJ 19 P. 18
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); SJ 21
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; SJ 18
- Committee Amendment # 2019-2181s, AF, VV; 05/30/2019; SJ 18
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2181s, 05/30/2019; SC 24
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/11/2019, Room 103, SH, 01:00 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; SC 17A
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 9
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0295h: MA VV 02/28/2019 HJ 7 P. 51
- Amendment # 2019-0295h: AA VV 02/28/2019 HJ 7 P. 51
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0295h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 19-1; RC) HC 13 P. 27
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am LOB 204
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/30/2019 10:00 am LOB 204
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 10:00 am LOB 204
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 3 P. 17