+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate MA VV
On November 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 19-0; CC); HC 1
On October 24, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/13/2013 1:00 PM LOB 202
On September 6, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/19/2013 10:30 AM LOB 202
On July 2, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/5/2013 10:30 AM LOB 202
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/25/2013 10:30 AM LOB 202
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/5/2013 2:00 PM LOB 202
- Subcommittee Work Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 AM LOB 202
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 1:00 PM LOB 202
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2013 10:00 AM LOB 202
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 11:00 AM LOB 202
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Ways and Means; HJ 12, PG.197