+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 31; Eff: 07/14/2019
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/02/2019 HJ 14 P. 42
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); SJ 16
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1546e: AA VV 04/11/2019 HJ 13 P. 126
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1546e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 04/18/2019); SJ 14
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; SJ 12
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; CC SC 17
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/03/2019, Room 101, LOB, 09:20 am; SC 15
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 9
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 02/28/2019 HJ 7 P. 16
- Referred to Finance 02/28/2019 HJ 7 P. 2
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/28/2019 HJ 7 P. 2
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 7-4; RC) HC 13 P. 21
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am LOB 303
- Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 10:30 am LOB 303
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration HJ 3 P. 17
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor