+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 41
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 50 P. 8
On October 11, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am LOB 303
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2019 09:30 am LOB 303
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/05/2019 10:30 am LOB 303
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 10:00 am LOB 303
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture HJ 3 P. 16