+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/08/2017 HJ 9 P. 42
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2017 01:00 PM LOB 301
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 11:00 AM LOB 301
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Municipal and County Government HJ 3 P. 15