+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 48
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 21-0; CC) HC 50 P. 11
On October 22, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am LOB 205
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm LOB 205
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 10:30 am LOB 104
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:00 am LOB 205
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 16