+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA DV 189-147 03/09/2017 HJ 10 P. 47
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 14-6; RC)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2017 01:00 PM LOB 301
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 10:40 AM LOB 301
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Municipal and County Government HJ 3 P. 15
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor