+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 287-48; HJ 24, PG.697-699
- Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Hoell); HJ 24, PG.649
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 6 (Vote 18-0; CC); HC 20, PG.408
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/19/2013 1:45 PM LOB 207
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 11:00 AM LOB 207
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; HJ 12, PG.197
+ − Vote
March 6, 2013: ITL
- Yeas: 287
- Nays: 48
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor