+ − Actions (6)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95164452682
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/05/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link: To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97676008758 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Vacated and Referred to Judiciary (): MA VV (in recess of) 01/06/2021 HJ 2 P. 58
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93611943701 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 10, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development HJ 2 P. 49
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor