+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): MA VV 01/09/2020 HJ 2 P. 31
On November 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2810h (Vote 16-5; RC) HC 50 P. 28
On October 16, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/30/2019 10:30 am LOB 201
- Full Committee Work Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am LOB 201
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 10/16/2019 01:15 pm LOB 201
On September 4, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/17/2019 01:15 pm LOB 201
On August 21, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/04/2019 10:00 am LOB 201
On August 20, 2019 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/04/2019 01:30 pm LOB 201
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am LOB 201
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:30 am LOB 201
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 10:00 am LOB 201-203
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways HJ 3 P. 16