+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 30; I. Sec. 3 Eff: 11/20/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 05/15/2019
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/02/2019 HJ 14 P. 42
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); SJ 16
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1636e: AA VV 04/11/2019 HJ 13 P. 127
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1636e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 04/25/2019); SJ 15
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; SJ 13
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/18/2019; SC 18
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/11/2019, Room 101, LOB, 01:20 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; SC 17A
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 12
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0938h: MA VV 03/20/2019 HJ 11 P. 25
- Amendment # 2019-0938h: AA VV 03/20/2019 HJ 11 P. 25
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0938h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 16-4; RC) HC 16 P. 32
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am LOB 305
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 10:00 am LOB 305
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development HJ 3 P. 15