+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 05/02/2024; SJ 11
On April 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 17
On April 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:20 am; SC 17
On February 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 6
On January 3, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-2284h: AA VV 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 65
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2284h: MA VV 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 65
On November 13, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2284h 11/01/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 49 P. 20
On October 25, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2023-2284h: 11/01/2023 10:45 am LOB 306-308 HC 43
On October 11, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/01/2023 10:00 am LOB 306-308 HC 41
On September 28, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 10/11/2023 10:00 am LOB 306-308 HC 39
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2023 10:30 am LOB 305-307
On January 17, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 01:00 pm LOB 305-307
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development HJ 3 P. 17