+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 205-136 03/14/2019 HJ 9 P. 25
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/14/2019 (Vote 17-2; RC) HC 15 P. 9
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm LOB 301
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 02:00 pm LOB 301
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government HJ 3 P. 15
+ − Vote
March 14, 2019: ITL
- Yeas: 205
- Nays: 136
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 47
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor