+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 7/20/2015; Chapter 262; Effective Date 7/1/2015
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of 6/24/2015); HJ 54, PG. 2142
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); SJ 19
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2345EBA (NT): AA VV (In recess of 6/24/2015); HJ 54, PG. 2140
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2345e, NT, Adopted, VV, (In recess of 6/24/2015); SJ 19
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2311c: Adopted, VV; HJ 54, PG. 2125
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 2311c; Adopted, VV; SJ 19
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report #2015-2311c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conferee Change; Senator Bradley Replaces Senator Lasky
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 6/18/2015 10:00 AM LOB 306
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Carson, Daniels and Lasky
- Sen. Carson accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; SJ 18
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps Sytek, Kurk, Barry, A. Christie; HJ 46, PG. 1989
- House Non Concurs with Senate Amendments and Requests Committee of Conference (Reps A. Christie and Tholl): MA VV; HJ 46, PG. 1988-1989
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 1727s, and 2030, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 17
- Sen. Forrester Floor Amendment #2015-2030s, NT, AA, VV; SJ 17
- Committee Amendment 1727s, AA, VV
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1727s, 6/4/15; SC24
- Special Order HB 468-FN to the Next Session, Without Objection, MA; SJ 16
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1727s, 5/28/15; SC23
- Special Order HB 468 to the Next Session, Without Objection, MA; SJ 15
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1727s, 5/21/15; SC22
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/14/15, Room 100, SH, 9:00 a.m.; SC17
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 11
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ 28, PG. 1290
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 25 (Vote 14-3; RC); HC 23, PG. 633
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 3/17/2015 10:30 AM LOB 204
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0349h: MA VV; HJ 20, PG. 499-500
- Amendment #0349h: AA VV; HJ 20, PG. 499-500
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0349h for Feb 18 (Vote 11-1; CC); HC13, PG. 239
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 2/11/2015 4:45 PM LOB 306
- ==CANCELED== Executive Session: 2/10/2015 2:45 PM LOB 306
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 10:00 AM LOB 306
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; HJ 12, PG. 225
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor