+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 05/18/2023; SJ 15
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; CC; 05/18/2023; SC 22
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Hearing: 04/25/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:30 am; SC 19
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/30/2023 and Referred to Education; SJ 13
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA RC 192-184 03/09/2023 HJ 8 P. 40
- Reconsider HB464 (Rep. Wood): MF DV 181-196 03/09/2023 HJ 8 P. 42
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/06/2023 (Vote ; RC) HC 14 P. 13
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/06/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education HJ 3 P. 17
- Public Hearing: 01/19/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
+ − Vote
March 9, 2023: OTP
- Yeas: 192
- Nays: 184
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 19
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor