+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 327; I. Sec. 5 & 7 Eff: as provided in Sec. 8 II. Rem. Eff: 10/15/2019
On July 29, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 59
On July 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On July 18, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2674e: AA VV 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 57
On July 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2674e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2019-2624c, Adopted, VV; 06/27/2019; SJ 21
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2624c: Adopted, VV 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 32
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2624c; 06/27/2019
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 06/18/2019 11:45 am LOB 304
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Fuller Clark, Watters, Giuda; (In Recess 06/06/2019); SJ 20
- Sen. Fuller Clark Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; (In recess 06/06/2019); SJ 20
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1967s and Requests CofC (Rep. Backus): MA VV 06/06/2019 HJ 18 P. 42
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. McGhee, Saunderson, Moffett, Mann 06/06/2019 HJ 18 P. 42
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1967s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; SJ 17
- Committee Amendment # 2019-1967s, AA, VV; 05/23/2019; SJ 17
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1967s, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 23
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/30/2019, Room 103, SH, 09:30 am; SC 20
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 12
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0804h: MA VV 03/20/2019 HJ 11 P. 30
- Amendment # 2019-0804h: AA VV 03/20/2019 HJ 11 P. 30
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0804h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-7; RC) HC 16 P. 33
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:30 am LOB 304
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/12/2019 03:00 pm LOB 304
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 3 P. 15