+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 01/06/2016; SJ 1
On November 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; SC49
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson moved to Rerefer to Committee, MA, VV; SJ 14
- Ought to Pass: MF, VV; SJ 14
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/14/15; SC21
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/22/15, Room 101, LOB, 9:30 a.m.; SC17
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 8
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ 22, PG. 585-587
- Floor Amendment #2015-0521h (Rep Rosenwald): AF RC 104-244; HJ 22, PG. 585-587
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0346h
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 4 (Vote 19-5; RC); HC18, PG. 358
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/12/2015 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 2/10/2015 11:30 AM LOB 212
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Continued Public Hearing: 2/4/2015 2:00 PM LOB 210-211
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/2/2015 1:30 PM LOB 210-211 ==RECESSED==
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Finance; HJ 12, PG. 225