+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate MA VV
On November 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; CC); HC 1
On October 18, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/30/2013 10:00 AM LOB 205
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/30/2013 9:00 AM LOB 205
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2013 10:30 AM LOB 205
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/9/2013 10:30 AM LOB 205
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/7/2013 11:30 AM LOB 205
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/14/2013 LOB 205 11:00 AM Or One Hour After Governor's Budget Address
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 3:00 PM LOB 205
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; HJ 12, PG.196
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor