+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 7/20/2015; Chapter 261; Section 2 Effective 11/1/2015; Remaining Effective 7/20/2015
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of 6/24/2015); HJ 54, PG. 2142
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); SJ 19
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2357EBA: AA VV (In recess of 6/24/2015); HJ 54, PG. 2140
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2357e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 6/24/2015); SJ 19
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2145c: Adopted, VV; HJ 54, PG. 2125
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 2145c; Adopted, VV; SJ 19
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report #2015-2145c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 6/11/2015 12:45 PM SH 100
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Daniels, Watters, and Birdsell
- Sen. Stiles Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; SJ 17
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1478s and Requests Committee of Conference (Rep Chandler): MA VV; HJ 44, PG. 1815
- Speaker Appoints: Reps Chandler, F. Tilton, Cloutier, Ebel; HJ 44, PG. 1815
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1478s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 13
- Committee Amendment 1478s, NT, AA, VV
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1478s, NT, 5/7/15; Vote 5-0; CC; SC20
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/31/15, Room 103, LOB, 1:15 p.m.; SC15
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Transportation; SJ 10
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0575h: MA VV; HJ 24, PG. 798-799
- Amendment #0575h: AA VV; HJ 24, PG. 798-799
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0575h (NT) for Mar 11 (Vote 15-0; CC); HC19, PG. 406
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 AM LOB 201
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 11:00 AM LOB 201
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways; HJ 12, PG. 224