+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-2069s and 2023-2070s (Reps. Roy, Weber): MA VV 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 2
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2023-2070s, AA, VV; 06/01/2023; SJ 16
- Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2023-2069s, RC 13Y-10N, AA; 06/01/2023; SJ 16
- Sen. Soucy Moved to divide the Question on the motion of Ought to Pass with Amendment: Sections 1-7 and the effective date, and then Section 8 and the effective date; 06/1/2023; SJ 16
- The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 06/01/2023; SJ 16
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2023-2070s and 2023-2069s: Sections 1-7 and the effective date, MA, VV; 06/01/2023; SJ 16
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2023-2070s and 2023-2069s: Section 8 and the effective date, RC 14Y-9N, MA; OT3rdg; 06/01/2023; SJ 16
- Without Objection, the Clerk is authorized to make technical and administrative corrections which are necessary to reflect the intent of the Senate, MA; 06/01/2023; SJ 16
On May 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 06/01/2023; SC 24
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 21
On April 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/27/2023, Room 103, SH, 01:15 pm; SC 19
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/30/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 13
On April 6, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0915h: AA VV 04/06/2023 HJ 12 P. 195
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0915h: MA VV 04/06/2023 HJ 12 P. 195
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0915h 03/21/2023 (Vote 21-3; RC) HC 12 P. 4
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/20/2023 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Division Work Session: 03/10/2023 10:00 am LOB 212
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0371h: AA VV 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 4
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0371h: MA VV 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 4
- Referred to Finance 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 5
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0371h(NT) 02/16/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 12 P. 4
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/16/2023 09:00 am LOB 202-204
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 10:00 am LOB 202-204
On December 23, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2023: Floor Amendment
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Nay
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Nay
- Lou D'Allesandro: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Nay
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Nay
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Nay
- Donovan Fenton: Nay
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Excused
- Rebecca Whitley: Nay
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Nay
- Denise Ricciardi: Nay
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea
June 1, 2023: Ought to Pass w/ Amendment Sections 8 and Effective Date
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Nay
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Nay
- Lou D'Allesandro: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Nay
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Nay
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Nay
- Donovan Fenton: Nay
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Excused
- Rebecca Whitley: Nay
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Nay
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor