+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sen. Bradley Moved Laid On Table, MA, VV: SJ 11
- Ought to Pass with Amendment Not Voted On
- Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2014-1648s, NT, AA, VV
- Committee Amendment 1513s, NT, AA, VV
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1513s, NT, 5/1/14; SC16
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/8/14, Room 101, LOB, 1:40 p.m.; SC13
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Schroadter)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report:Ought to Pass for Mar 25 (Vote 19-0;CC)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/18/2014 10:30 AM LOB 202 (Time Change)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 3/10/2014 10:30 AM LOB 202
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 3/6/2014 10:30 AM LOB 202
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Refer to Interim Study MF VV
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0014h(NT) MA VV
- Adopt Amendment #2014-0014h (New Title) AA VV
- Referred to Ways and Means
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from Consent Calandar (Rep. Hunt)
On November 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 20-0; CC); HC 1
On October 4, 2013 in the House:
- ==Rescheduled== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:30 AM LOB 302
On October 3, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session Joint with House Enviroment and Agriculture: 10/16/2013 10:00 AM LOB 303
On September 25, 2013 in the House:
- ==Cancelled==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 AM LOB 302
- =New Date= Retained Bill-Subcommittee Work Session Joint with House Enviroment and Agriculture: 10/10/2013 10:00 AM LOB 303
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 AM LOB 302
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 2:45 PM LOB 302
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/21/2013 1:15 PM LOB 302
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; HJ 12, PG.196
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor